IA HSB93 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF215
Note: Legislation replaced by HF318

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to certain filing deadlines for property tax credits available to certain elderly, disabled, and low-income persons and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 318.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to certain filing deadlines for property tax credits available to certain elderly, disabled, and low-income persons and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 318.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 318.
2023-02-14HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 310.
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-01-30HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 1:30PM RM 19.
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee: Gustafson, Gehlbach and Wilson. H.J. 188.
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 186.
2023-01-25HouseBy COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

SSB1088 (Related) 2023-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 215.
SF215 (Replaced by) 2023-02-15 - Subcommittee: Rowley, Dawson, and Winckler. S.J. 340.
HF318 (Replaced by) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback