IA HSB91 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF296
Note: Legislation replaced by HF794

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 794.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice.(See HF 794.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice.(See HF 794.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 794.
2021-03-03HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 594.
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 12:30PM Law Library.
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee: Meyer, A., Bradley and Forbes. H.J. 126.
2021-01-20HouseIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 123.
2021-01-20HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

SSB1095 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296.
SF296 (Replaced by) 2021-04-08 - Message from House, with amendment S-3144. S.J. 841.
HF794 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 910.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback