IA HSB80 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF265

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to midwife licensure, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 265.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to midwife licensure, providing for fees, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 265.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-13HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 265.
2023-02-08HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 297.
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 4:30PM House Lounge 2.
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Kurth. H.J. 179.
2023-01-24HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 178.
2023-01-24HouseBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Same As/Similar To

HF265 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1039.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback