IA HSB751 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2441
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2707
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2707
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2707.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2707.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to transactions involving used catalytic converters.(See HF 2707.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to transactions involving used catalytic converters.(See HF 2707.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2707. |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 873. |
2024-04-17 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Best, Bloomingdale, Boden, Croken, Deyoe, Forbes, Gjerde, Harris, Isenhart, Jacoby, Johnson, Jones, Judge, Kniff McCulla, Kurth, Lundgren, Nielsen, Osmundson, Sexton, Siegrist, Thompson, P., Wills, J., Wilson and Wulf. H.J. 836. |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 835. |
2024-04-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3206 (Related) 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2441.
SF2441 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 933.
HF2707 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 941.
SF2441 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 933.
HF2707 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 941.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB751 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB751.html |