IA HSB75 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF764
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 764.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disciplinary hearings conducted by professional licensing boards.(See HF 764.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to disciplinary hearings conducted by professional licensing boards.(See HF 764.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 764. |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 594. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 1:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Bennett and Jeneary. H.J. 119. |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 117. |
2021-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1112 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
HF764 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee: Bergan, Brown-Powers and Osmundson. H.J. 699.
HF764 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee: Bergan, Brown-Powers and Osmundson. H.J. 699.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB75 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB75.html |