IA HSB743 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of providers by Medicaid managed care organizations for items or services subject to prior authorization.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of providers by Medicaid managed care organizations for items or services subject to prior authorization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2024 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2024-03-26 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Johnson and Kurth. H.J. 681. |
2024-03-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 681. |
2024-03-26 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB743 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB743.html |