IA HSB72 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act exempting the storage of household goods and mini-storage from the sales tax on services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act exempting the storage of household goods and mini-storage from the sales tax on services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
2023-02-06HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 12:30PM House Lounge 2.
2023-01-20HouseSubcommittee: Deyoe, Croken and Johnson. H.J. 133.
2023-01-20HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 132.
2023-01-20HouseBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback