IA HSB717 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the liability for recapture taxes imposed on certain property receiving a fruit-tree or forest reservation property tax exemption and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the liability for recapture taxes imposed on certain property receiving a fruit-tree or forest reservation property tax exemption and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2022 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Maxwell and Staed. H.J. 258. |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 256. |
2022-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB717 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB717.html |