IA HSB716 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting the storage of household goods and mini-storage from the sales tax on services.
Title
A bill for an act exempting the storage of household goods and mini-storage from the sales tax on services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2022 5:00PM RM 304. |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Kurth and Osmundson. H.J. 258. |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 256. |
2022-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3156 (Related) 2022-03-16 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB716 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB716.html |