IA HSB714 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2611
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2630
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2630
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2611.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school funding, including the teacher salary supplement cost per pupil and teacher and education support professional compensation, and making appropriations.(See HF 2611, HF 2630.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to school funding, including the teacher salary supplement cost per pupil and teacher and education support professional compensation, and making appropriations.(See HF 2611, HF 2630.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2611. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 318. |
2024-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2024 12:30PM RM 19. |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Cahill and Gehlbach. H.J. 268. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 267. |
2024-02-14 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF2611 (Replaced by) 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.
HF2630 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Fiscal note.
HF2630 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB714 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB714.html |