IA HSB702 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2357
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2542
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2542
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice and licensure of physician assistants.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice and licensure of physician assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 320. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Bacon and Brown-Powers. H.J. 294. |
2020-02-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3071 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2357.
SF2357 (Replaced by) 2020-03-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
HF2542 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 587.
SF2357 (Replaced by) 2020-03-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
HF2542 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 587.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB702 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB702.html |