IA HSB694 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the standard crossing fee a public utility owes to a railroad under certain circumstances.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the standard crossing fee a public utility owes to a railroad under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Cohoon and Moore, T. H.J. 210. |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 207. |
2022-02-09 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB694 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB694.html |