IA HSB674 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2208
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2506
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2506
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, providing civil penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2506.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, providing civil penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2506.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2506. |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 261. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Sorensen, Hall and Lohse. H.J. 243. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 5:15PM House Lounge 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Lohse and Smith. H.J. 200. |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Information Technology. H.J. 197. |
2022-02-08 | House | By COMMITTEE ON INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2208 (Replaced by) 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee: Nunn, Mathis, and Williams. S.J. 250.
HF2506 (Replaced by) 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 513.
HF2506 (Replaced by) 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 513.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB674 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB674.html |