IA HSB672 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2480
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to informed consent for medication abortions, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to informed consent for medication abortions, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 310. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 2:15PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Fry and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 253. |
2020-02-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2480 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 317.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB672 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB672.html |