IA HSB658 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2583
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to relating to court-ordered reimbursement of jail costs and restitution.
Title
A bill for an act to relating to court-ordered reimbursement of jail costs and restitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 8:35AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Klein and Wolfe. H.J. 209. |
2020-02-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3130 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Whiting.
HF2583 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Fiscal note.
HF2583 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB658 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB658.html |