IA HSB654 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2530
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2530.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2530.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to third-party testers for commercial driver's license driving skills tests.(See HF 2530.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to third-party testers for commercial driver's license driving skills tests.(See HF 2530.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2530. |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 294. |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 5:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Bush, Cisneros and Hansen. H.J. 200. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Bush, Cisneros and Prichard. H.J. 177. |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 175. |
2022-02-02 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF2530 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 542.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB654 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB654.html |