IA HSB64 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF86
Note: Legislation replaced by HF228

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 228.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to voluntary diversity plans under the state's open enrollment law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to voluntary diversity plans under the state's open enrollment law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 228.
2021-01-27HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 224.
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 12:15PM Law Library.
2021-01-15HouseSubcommittee: Hite, Smith and Wills. H.J. 113.
2021-01-15HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 113.
2021-01-15HouseBy COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

HF86 (Replaced by) 2021-02-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 281.
HF228 (Replaced by) 2021-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2021 9:30AM 217 Conference Room.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback