IA HSB631 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2434
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2602
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2602
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county emergency medical services by modifying provisions relating to optional taxes for emergency medical services.
Title
A bill for an act relating to county emergency medical services by modifying provisions relating to optional taxes for emergency medical services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2020 4:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, Kaufmann, Bloomingdale, Nielsen and Steckman. H.J. 200. |
2020-02-05 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2434 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 446.
HF2602 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 449.
HF2602 (Replaced by) 2020-03-04 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 449.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB631 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB631.html |