IA HSB627 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2381
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disposition of a child found to have committed a delinquent act.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disposition of a child found to have committed a delinquent act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2018 9:30AM House Lounge |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 12:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Hein and Lensing. H.J. 218. |
2018-02-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2381 (Replaced by) 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 768.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB627 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB627.html |