IA HSB620 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-3
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-3
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to trains blocking highways, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to trains blocking highways, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 0-3 |
2022-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2022 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Sunde and Worthan. H.J. 131. |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 130. |
2022-01-26 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB620 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB620.html |