IA HSB62 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2017 11:15AM House Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2017 11:15AM House Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mechanics’ liens and public construction liens.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mechanics’ liens and public construction liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2017 11:15AM House Lounge |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: McKean, Bennett and Koester. H.J. 148. |
2017-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1092 (Related) 2017-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2017 8:45AM Room 206
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB62 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB62.html |