IA HSB61 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF717

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 717.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the assessment and valuation of property rented or leased to certain low-income individuals and families and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 717.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the assessment and valuation of property rented or leased to certain low-income individuals and families and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 717.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-13HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 717.
2023-04-13HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 861.
2023-03-22HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-03-21HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/22/2023 8:30AM House Lounge.
2023-02-15HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2023 12:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled).
2023-02-07HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2023 12:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled).
2023-01-20HouseSubcommittee: Boden, Nielsen and Siegrist. H.J. 132.
2023-01-20HouseIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 130.
2023-01-20HouseBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Same As/Similar To

HF717 (Replaced by) 2023-04-20 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Koelker. S.J. 918.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback