IA HSB605 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2166
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2318
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2318
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to redemption by certain persons of parcels sold at tax sale.
Title
A bill for an act relating to redemption by certain persons of parcels sold at tax sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 11:00AM House Lounge |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: McKean, Bossman and Bennett. H.J. 193. |
2018-01-31 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2166 (Replaced by) 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 704.
HF2318 (Replaced by) 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
SSB3012 (Related) 2018-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2318 (Replaced by) 2018-03-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 700.
SSB3012 (Related) 2018-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB605 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB605.html |