IA HSB604 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for advance deposit wagering on gambling games.
Title
A bill for an act providing for advance deposit wagering on gambling games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 12:00PM RM 304. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Cohoon and Mitchell. H.J. 119. |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 115. |
2022-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB604 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB604.html |