IA HSB600 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2246
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 11:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 11:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to remote testimony in civil and criminal court proceedings.
Title
A bill for an act relating to remote testimony in civil and criminal court proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 11:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled). |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Hite, Lohse and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 160. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Lohse and Wolfe. H.J. 118. |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 115. |
2022-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3061 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2246.
SF2246 (Replaced by) 2022-02-21 - Fiscal note.
SF2246 (Replaced by) 2022-02-21 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB600 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB600.html |