IA HSB583 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2019
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2343

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee: Fry, Lundgren and Forbes. H.J. 153.
2020-01-28HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

SF2019 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Jochum, and Miller-Meeks. S.J. 121.
SSB3164 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2343.
SF2343 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 374.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback