IA HSB581 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2194
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2425
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2425
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2425.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2425.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the department of administrative services' process for managing the physical resources of state government, including the selection of state employees' office space.(See HF 2425.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the department of administrative services' process for managing the physical resources of state government, including the selection of state employees' office space.(See HF 2425.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2425. |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 219. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Sexton and Srinivas. H.J. 110. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 107. |
2024-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3053 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2194.
SF2194 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
HF2425 (Replaced by) 2024-02-08 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 229.
SF2194 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536.
HF2425 (Replaced by) 2024-02-08 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 229.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB581 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB581.html |