IA HSB570 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2150
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2185
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2185
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2150.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2150.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act eliminating a requirement related to obtaining a transitional coaching authorization from the board of educational examiners.(See HF 2150.)
Title
A bill for an act eliminating a requirement related to obtaining a transitional coaching authorization from the board of educational examiners.(See HF 2150.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2150. |
2024-01-23 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 135. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:00PM RM 304. |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Ehlert and Moore, T. H.J. 104. |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 101. |
2024-01-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3049 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2185.
HF2150 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Senate amendment H-8223 filed. H.J. 626.
SF2185 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 577.
HF2150 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Senate amendment H-8223 filed. H.J. 626.
SF2185 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 577.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB570 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB570.html |