IA HSB569 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2152
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2364
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2364
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the reporting requirements of the department of education's commission on educator leadership and compensation.(See HF 2152.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the reporting requirements of the department of education's commission on educator leadership and compensation.(See HF 2152.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2152. |
2024-01-23 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 134. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:45PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Cahill and Gehlbach. H.J. 104. |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 101. |
2024-01-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3047 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2364.
HF2152 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SF2364 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 601.
HF2152 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 772.
SF2364 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 601.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB569 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB569.html |