IA HSB569 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2275
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to the disbursement of all Iowa opportunity scholarships.
Title
A study bill relating to the disbursement of all Iowa opportunity scholarships.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Voted - Education. |
2016-02-10 | House | 10:30AM; House Lounge Education. |
2016-02-08 | House | Education: Gassman Chair,Abdul-Samad, and Dolecheck. |
2016-02-04 | House | In Education |
2016-02-04 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2275 (Replaced by) 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 585.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB569 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB569.html |