IA HSB564 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to investigations conducted by the office of ombudsman.
Title
A bill for an act relating to investigations conducted by the office of ombudsman.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Jacobsen and Kurth. H.J. 96. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 93. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB564 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB564.html |