IA HSB564 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2404
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to apparel requirements for persons passing through public land or water during a muzzleloading season, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to apparel requirements for persons passing through public land or water during a muzzleloading season, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 3:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Osmundson and Ourth. H.J. 172. |
2020-01-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2404 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Amendment H-8037 filed. H.J. 395.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB564 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB564.html |