IA HSB562 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2379
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Voted - Public Safety.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-12 - Voted - Public Safety.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to motor vehicle impoundment when the vehicle is operated by a person with a denied, canceled, suspended, or revoked driver's license, and providing penalties.
Title
A study bill relating to motor vehicle impoundment when the vehicle is operated by a person with a denied, canceled, suspended, or revoked driver's license, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Voted - Public Safety. |
2016-02-09 | House | 9:00AM; House Lounge Public Safety. |
2016-02-04 | House | Public Safety: Klein Chair,Holt, and Wolfe. |
2016-02-02 | House | In Public Safety |
2016-02-02 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2379 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 456.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB562 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB562.html |