IA HSB558 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2161
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2363
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2363
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2161.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2161.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for a sex offender to be granted a modification of sex offender registry requirements.(See HF 2161.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for a sex offender to be granted a modification of sex offender registry requirements.(See HF 2161.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2161. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 120. |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 8:30AM RM 19. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Klein, Gaines and Paustian. H.J. 96. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 92. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3025 (Related) 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2363.
HF2161 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2363 (Replaced by) 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
HF2161 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2363 (Replaced by) 2022-06-27 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB558 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB558.html |