IA HSB557 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF2188
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2634

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2188.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act removing the maximum annual amount of real estate transfer tax receipts that may be transferred into the housing trust fund.(See HF 2188, HF 2634.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act removing the maximum annual amount of real estate transfer tax receipts that may be transferred into the housing trust fund.(See HF 2188, HF 2634.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-29HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2188.
2024-01-24HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 144.
2024-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2024-01-18HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2024-01-16HouseSubcommittee: Kniff McCulla, Osmundson and Scholten. H.J. 94.
2024-01-16HouseIntroduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 93.
2024-01-16HouseBy COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY

Same As/Similar To

HF2188 (Replaced by) 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.
HF2634 (Replaced by) 2024-04-02 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 727.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback