IA HSB557 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the minimum age relative to various activities relating to tobacco, tobacco products, alternative nicotine products, vapor products, and cigarettes, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act establishing the minimum age relative to various activities relating to tobacco, tobacco products, alternative nicotine products, vapor products, and cigarettes, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 330. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Lundgren and Anderson. H.J. 142. |
2020-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3016 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2268.
HF2135 (Replaced by) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
SF2268 (Replaced by) 2020-06-30 - Fiscal note.
HF2588 (Replaced by) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
HF2135 (Replaced by) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
SF2268 (Replaced by) 2020-06-30 - Fiscal note.
HF2588 (Replaced by) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 711.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB557 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB557.html |