IA HSB556 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2029
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2374
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2374
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing that a licensed veterinarian is immune from administrative, civil, or criminal liability in investigations or proceedings involving the mistreatment of animals.
Title
A bill for an act providing that a licensed veterinarian is immune from administrative, civil, or criminal liability in investigations or proceedings involving the mistreatment of animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 254. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 12:15PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Sorensen and Konfrst. H.J. 142. |
2020-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2029 (Replaced by) 2020-02-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2374 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 543.
HF2374 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 543.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB556 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB556.html |