IA HSB546 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2199
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2373
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2373
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 254.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the qualifications necessary for an applicant for licensure as a professional engineer.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the qualifications necessary for an applicant for licensure as a professional engineer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 254. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Mitchell and Nielsen. H.J. 142. |
2020-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3049 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2199.
SF2199 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Attached to companion HF 2373. S.J. 500.
HF2373 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2199. S.J. 500.
SF2199 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Attached to companion HF 2373. S.J. 500.
HF2373 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2199. S.J. 500.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB546 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB546.html |