IA HSB540 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2146
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for authorizing the dispensing of lottery tickets and products by self-service kiosks, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A study bill for authorizing the dispensing of lottery tickets and products by self-service kiosks, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Voted - State Government. |
2016-01-27 | House | 9:00AM; House Lounge State Government. |
2016-01-26 | House | State Government: Stanerson Chair,Cohoon, and Highfill. |
2016-01-26 | House | In State Government |
2016-01-26 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3042 (Related) 2016-01-19 - State Government: Danielson Chair,Bertrand, and McCoy.
HF2146 (Replaced by) 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 585.
HF2146 (Replaced by) 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 585.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB540 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB540.html |