IA HSB537 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF2339

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to judicial motions and causes of action arising from a person's participation in matters of public significance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to judicial motions and causes of action arising from a person's participation in matters of public significance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee: Hite, Paustian and Oldson. H.J. 141.
2020-01-22HouseBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HF2339 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Hogg, and Whiting. S.J. 451.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback