IA HSB535 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2381
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying duties to prescribe practices and procedures for implementation of a preapplication screening assessment program relating to the involuntary commitment or treatment of a person with a substance-related disorder.
Title
A bill for an act modifying duties to prescribe practices and procedures for implementation of a preapplication screening assessment program relating to the involuntary commitment or treatment of a person with a substance-related disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 264. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Bergan and Ehlert. H.J. 125. |
2020-01-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2381 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 269.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB535 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB535.html |