IA HSB525 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 0-0
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 0-0
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the rights of a crime victim.
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the rights of a crime victim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 0-0 |
2022-01-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2022 12:00PM RM 304. |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Anderson and Hite. H.J. 53. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 49. |
2022-01-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB525 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB525.html |