IA HSB517 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2452
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2312
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2312
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disposal and acquisition of city water utilities, including at-risk systems.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disposal and acquisition of city water utilities, including at-risk systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Lundgren and Williams. H.J. 111. |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 96. |
2020-01-16 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3008 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2312.
HF2452 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
SF2312 (Replaced by) 2020-06-12 - Withdrawn. S.J. 784.
HF2452 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
SF2312 (Replaced by) 2020-06-12 - Withdrawn. S.J. 784.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB517 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB517.html |