IA HSB517 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2427
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to certain child abuse and dependent adult abuse information by free clinics.
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to certain child abuse and dependent adult abuse information by free clinics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2018 11:30AM House Lounge |
2018-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Bergan and Hunter. H.J. 83. |
2018-01-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2427 (Replaced by) 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 768.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB517 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB517.html |