IA HSB51 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administering, prescribing, or ordering of immunizations or vaccines by a licensed podiatric physician, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administering, prescribing, or ordering of immunizations or vaccines by a licensed podiatric physician, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2023 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee: Bradley, Forbes and Jeneary. H.J. 119. |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 117. |
2023-01-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB51 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB51.html |