IA HSB507 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program eligibility verification.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program eligibility verification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2022 11:30AM RM 19 (Cancelled). |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Boden and Sunde. H.J. 51. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 46. |
2022-01-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB507 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB507.html |