IA HSB50 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF263

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for prescription insulin drugs, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 263.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to insurance coverage for prescription insulin drugs, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 263.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 263.
2021-01-27HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 225.
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 11:00AM House Lounge.
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee: Jeneary, Bennett and Boden. H.J. 107.
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 105.
2021-01-14HouseBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

HF263 (Replaced by) 2021-03-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback