IA HSB48 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF652
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of city and school elections.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of city and school elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 394. |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Jacobsen and Nielsen. H.J. 152. |
2019-01-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1077 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee: Smith, R., Celsi and Chapman.
HF652 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 755.
HF652 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Referred to State Government. H.J. 755.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB48 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB48.html |