IA HSB45 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF307
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs training and making an appropriation.(See HF 307.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs training and making an appropriation.(See HF 307.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 307. |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 258. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, Andrews and Brown-Powers. H.J. 89. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 86. |
2021-01-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HF307 (Replaced by) 2022-02-24 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2022 9:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled).
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB45 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB45.html |