IA HSB42 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF325
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to eligibility for a property tax exemption for certain property of veterans associations.(See HF 325.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to eligibility for a property tax exemption for certain property of veterans associations.(See HF 325.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 325. |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 258. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee: McClintock, Boden and Breckenridge. H.J. 88. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 86. |
2021-01-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HF325 (Replaced by) 2022-02-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB42 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB42.html |